Global Patent Index - EP 1092628 A1

EP 1092628 A1 2001-04-18 - A method for packaging products, an apparatus for implementing said method and a package thereby obtained

Title (en)

A method for packaging products, an apparatus for implementing said method and a package thereby obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Gegenständen, und erzeugte Verpackung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour emballer des objets, et emballage obtenu

Publication

EP 1092628 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00830669 A

Priority

IT BO990554 A

Abstract (en)

A method for packaging products comprises a feeding, from a continuous sheet (1) and according to a predetermined direction (A) of advance, of a quantity of packaging material towards a station (2) for positioning the product (3); an incision of the sides (1a, 1b) of the material parallel to the direction (A) of advance of the packaging material to define a plurality of consecutive and distinct tabs (4) along said sides; a cut of a quantity of material according to a value substantially equivalent to the outer perimeter of the product (3) to define a segment (5) of packaging material; a folding of the segment (5) around the product (3) in such a way as to present the tabs (4) in correspondence with the heads (3a, 3b) of the product (3); lastly, a wrapping of the product (3), covered by the packaging segment (5), by means of plastic film (6) to define a closed package (IC). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/58; B65D 75/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2006.01); B65D 75/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/58 (2013.01); B65D 75/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092628 A1 20010418; IT 1311095 B1 20020228; IT BO990554 A1 20010416; IT BO990554 D0 19991015

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20070104

2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070105

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AETNA GROUP S.P.A.

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI