Global Patent Index - EP 1092634 A1

EP 1092634 A1 2001-04-18 - Stackable container

Title (en)

Stackable container

Title (de)

Stapelbares Behältnis

Title (fr)

Récipient empilable

Publication

EP 1092634 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810937 A

Priority

EP 99810937 A

Abstract (en)

The stackable container has a shaped base (1), a shoulder (3) at an angle of 80 - 120 degrees to its wall (2), an opening (4) and stacking aids. These consist of either; (a) a ring with an inwardly-turned upper lip which cooperates with a suitably-shaped base on the container; or (b) a ring with an outwardly-turned upper lip which grips the base of the container.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Behältnis, bestehend aus einem Boden (1), einem Mantel (2) und einer Schulter (3), wobei diese Elemente spanlos umgeformt, einstückig, nahtlos und aus Leichtmetall sind. Die Schulter (3) steht in einem Winkel von 80° bis 120° zum Mantel (2), und das Behältnis weist minimum eine Öffnung (4) und Mittel zum Stapeln (5) auf. Durch diese flache Schulter (3) wird die Höhe reduziert, der Platzbedarf verringert sowie das Transportvolumen verkleinert. Der Ring als Mittel zum Stapeln (5) erlaubt das Aufeinanderstapeln der Behältnisse und dient gleichzeitig als Traghilfe. Die Behältnisse können ohne Umpackung versandt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 21/02; B65D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/16 (2006.01); B65D 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/0213 (2013.01); B65D 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092634 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-08-21 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020201

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOURNAIRE, S.A.

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI