Global patent index - EP 1092636 A2

EP 1092636 A2 2001-04-18 - Packaging bags and method of producing same

Title (en)

Packaging bags and method of producing same

Title (de)

Beutelpackungen und Vorrichtung zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Sachets d'emballage et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1092636 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122444 A

Priority

  • JP 29376199 A
  • US 67076300 A

Abstract (en)

Packaging bags (1) are produced by cutting a larger material sheet into individual portions and folding each of these individual pieces to form a main body having a front wall (2), a back wall (3), side walls (4) which stand up from a flat bottom (5). A lid (6) for closing the upper opening is uniformly sloped upward from the front wall to the back wall. A ridge (7) is formed, extending upward from the back wall, for sealing the bag closed. A trapezoidally folded flap (11) extends upward from the back wall and is folded forward over the seal ridge. A pair of fastening tapes (8) is used to keep the flap detachably attached to the seal ridge such that the bag, after it is once opened, can be closed again. Instead of the fastening tapes, an elongated member serving like a belt loop may be used to keep the flap retractably inserted under it to keep the flap closed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092636 A2 20010418; EP 1092636 A3 20020320

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020921

2003-01-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI