Global patent index - EP 1092637 A1

EP 1092637 A1 2001-04-18 - Closure element for containers

Title (en)

Closure element for containers

Title (de)

Verschlusselement für Gefässe

Title (fr)

Elément de fermeture pour conteneurs

Publication

EP 1092637 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120536 A

Priority

EP 99120536 A

Abstract (en)

The bottle stopper with a locking stirrup is made partly or wholly from china or another ceramic and carries a sealing ring (6) with a conical outer surface (7). This is made from a thermoplastic elastomer. The bottom of the stopper may be fitted with a cap (4) made from thermoplastic to which the sealing ring is bonded.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verschlußknopf für Flaschen beschrieben, der aus einem Grundteil (3) aus Porzellan und einem damit fest verbundenen Kappenteil (4) aus einer Hartkomponente besteht, welche einen an ihr gasdicht angebrachten Dichtring (6) trägt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 39/0082 (2013.01); B65D 2539/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092637 A1 20010418; EP 1092637 B1 20051228; DE 59912988 D1 20060202

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ROSLER CERAMTEC GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20111108

2011-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROESLER CERAMTEC GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59912988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59912988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20110920

2011-10-19 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: SD

- Effective date: 20111010

2011-09-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59912988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MANITZ, FINSTERWALD & PARTNER GBR, DE

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912988

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROESLER, GUIDO

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WEISSBACH, RALF

2005-06-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CLOSURE ELEMENT FOR CONTAINERS

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031210

2002-04-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020125

2002-04-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI