Global Patent Index - EP 1092650 A1

EP 1092650 A1 2001-04-18 - Protective cap for an actuating device as well as a packaging and dispensing system for fluids

Title (en)

Protective cap for an actuating device as well as a packaging and dispensing system for fluids

Title (de)

Schutzkappe für eine Betätigungsvorrichtung sowie Aufbewahrungs- und Abgabesystem für fliessfähige Medien

Title (fr)

Capuchon protecteur pour un dispositif d'actionnement ainsi q'un systeme d'emballage et de distribution pour fluides

Publication

EP 1092650 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00122183 A

Priority

  • DE 19949384 A
  • DE 29918083 U

Abstract (en)

The protective cap for the push button of a spray container is attached to the button and/or container and has an orifice (11) covered by a pivoted flap (20) which has a snap fastening which keeps it closed. The cap has the shape of a portion of a sphere and the flap completes the surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schutzkappe (10) für eine Betätigungsvorrichtung zur Abgabe von in einem Behälter gelagerten fließfähigen Medien. Die Schutzkappe (10) weist mindestens eine durch ein bewegliches Verschlußelement (20) verschließbare Öffnung (11) auf, durch welche die Betätigungsvorrichtung von außerhalb der Schutzkappe (10) zugänglich ist. Dies ermöglicht eine sichere Abschirmung der Betätigungsvorrichtung und gleichzeitig eine schnelle und einfache Bedienung. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner ein entsprechendes Aufbewahrungs- und Abgabesystem. Somit kann die Betätigungsvorrichtung bedient werden, ohne daß die Schutzkappe von dem Behälter bzw. der Betätigungsvorrichtung abgenommen wird. Die Schutzkappe kann fest mit dem Behälter verbunden werden, so daß ein versehentliches Lösen derselben von dem Behälter deutlich erschwert oder sogar unmöglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/16; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/16 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/205 (2013.01); B65D 83/40 (2013.01); B65D 83/56 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918083 U1 19991230; DE 50011956 D1 20060202; EP 1092650 A1 20010418; EP 1092650 B1 20051228

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SEAQUIST PERFECT DISPENSING GMBH, 44319 DORTMUND, DE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20121220

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130611

2013-06-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2013-01-11 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR DORTMUND GMBH

- Effective date: 20121213

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50011956

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060403

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011956 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI