Global Patent Index - EP 1092651 A1

EP 1092651 A1 2001-04-18 - Package for conditioning and presenting articles grouped in batches

Title (en)

Package for conditioning and presenting articles grouped in batches

Title (fr)

Emballage pour le conditionnement et la présentation d'articles regroupés par lots

Publication

EP 1092651 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420208 A

Priority

FR 9912980 A

Abstract (en)

Packaging comprises a base (3) to receive the articles (2), made of a bottom wall (5) and three side walls (6,7). The packaging is closed by a cover (4). The cover is fitting in the base and can be stuck to it in order to close the parcel.

Abstract (fr)

Cet emballage comprend en combinaison une barquette (3) qui, servant de supports aux articles (2), comporte un fond (5) délimité le long de trois de ses bords par trois côtés (6, 7), le quatrième bord étant libre, et une coiffe (4) qui, destinée à venir recouvrir les articles (2) et à être fixée sur la barquette (3), ferme au moins partiellement l'emballage le long du bord de celui-ci ne comportant pas de côté. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 85/62; B65D 5/32; B65D 71/06; B65D 71/38; B65D 77/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/06 (2006.01); B65D 71/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/38 (2013.01); B65D 71/066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092651 A1 20010418; EP 1092651 B1 20040811; DE 60012841 D1 20040916; DE 60012841 T2 20041230; ES 2223432 T3 20050301; FR 2799745 A1 20010420; FR 2799745 B1 20020118; PT 1092651 E 20041029

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091012

2011-03-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20110302

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091012

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2010-04-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050512

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2223432

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040812

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60012841

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT PT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010620

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI