Global Patent Index - EP 1092653 A2

EP 1092653 A2 2001-04-18 - Automated vertical store

Title (en)

Automated vertical store

Title (de)

Senkrechtes Lager

Title (fr)

Entrepôt vertical

Publication

EP 1092653 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122458 A

Priority

IT TO990903 A

Abstract (en)

An automated vertical store (1) having a number of posts (3)(4), and a number of cross members (7) which define a number of seats (8) for respective containers (2) and are connected to the posts (3)(4) by a releasable fast-fit connecting assembly (10); the connecting assembly (10) having, for each cross member (7), at least a first (13) and at least a second (15) anchoring bracket, which are carried by the cross member (7) and have respective elongated anchoring portions (18) extending in respective directions crosswise to each other, and cooperating with and resting against relative retaining surfaces (19) of the posts (3)(4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/40 (2006.01); A47B 96/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/40 (2013.01); A47B 96/1441 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092653 A2 20010418; EP 1092653 A3 20010530; EP 1092653 B1 20040818; DE 60013058 D1 20040923; DE 60013058 T2 20050908; ES 2224988 T3 20050316; IT 1311236 B1 20020304; IT TO990903 A1 20010416; IT TO990903 D0 19991015

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110321

2011-03-31 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-10-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090910 AND 20090916

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081105

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224988 T3

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60013058 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANCO, RENATO

2001-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GHIBAUDO, GIUSEPPE

2001-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PONTINI, MASSIMO

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI