Global Patent Index - EP 1092667 A2

EP 1092667 A2 2001-04-18 - Automatic winder

Title (en)

Automatic winder

Title (de)

Automatische Wickelmaschine

Title (fr)

Bobinoir automatique

Publication

EP 1092667 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00121696 A

Priority

  • JP 29082299 A
  • JP 29082399 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides an automatic winder that eliminates the need to attach and remove a tray guide, as required in the prior art, and that can increase a tilting angle of a standing frame. The automatic winder has winding units 14 each comprising a bobbin supply and ejection device 17, a yarn joining device 18, and a winding device 19. The winding unit 14 is divided into a lower part 21 including the bobbin supply and ejection device 17 and an upper part 20 including the yarn joining device 18 and the winding device 19. The upper part 20 can be tilted from a winding position A where it is stood up to a tilted position C where it is tilted toward an operation passage side F. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/72; B65H 54/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2006.01); B65H 54/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/70 (2013.01); B65H 54/72 (2013.01); B65H 2407/32 (2013.01); B65H 2601/321 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092667 A2 20010418; EP 1092667 A3 20020619; EP 1092667 B1 20051228; DE 60025118 D1 20060202; DE 60025118 T2 20060831; DE 60037693 D1 20080214; DE 60037693 T2 20090102; EP 1616827 A1 20060118; EP 1616827 B1 20080102

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60025118

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60025118

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025118 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-05-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KONO, SATORU

2005-05-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TANIGAWA, YASUNOBU

2005-03-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AUTOMATIC WINDER

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI