Global Patent Index - EP 1092671 A2

EP 1092671 A2 2001-04-18 - Loading aircraft stores

Title (en)

Loading aircraft stores

Title (de)

Laden von Flugzeugen

Title (fr)

Chargements d'aéronefs

Publication

EP 1092671 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305830 A

Priority

  • GB 9917195 A
  • GB 9928224 A

Abstract (en)

The invention is concerned with a tricycle vehicle (Fig.7) for the conveyance of large and heavy items, as 17, to be supported on a detachable cradle 15 forming part of said vehicle, for presentation of such item for capture at an aircraft pylon station at a sub-wing level of the aircraft. The vehicle has trolley parts 11, 13, which engage the cradle 15 fore and aft. The trolley 11 has a steerable ground wheel and a jack arrangement for raising and lowering the front end of the cradle as required and the trolley 13 has two transversely spaced ground wheels and associated jacking arrangements for independent vertical movement of the rear end of the cradle at either side. The vehicle has means adjustable and/or detachable such as to enable the vehicle to adopt a variety of configurations calculated to facilitate the extraction of the vehicle from beneath the aircraft notwithstanding the presence of obstructions occasioned by changes in aircraft geometry resulting from the attachment of the load to the pylon station. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66F 7/02; B64D 7/00; B64F 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/87 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092671 A2 20010418; EP 1092671 A3 20011205; EP 1092671 B1 20050302; DE 60018348 D1 20050407

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1038549

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-04-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-06-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018348

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2005-03-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050302

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020314

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 66F 7/02 A, 7B 64F 1/32 B, 7B 64D 7/00 B, 7F 41A 9/87 B, 7B 66F 9/06 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI