Global Patent Index - EP 1092673 A1

EP 1092673 A1 2001-04-18 - High-pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (en)

High-pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (de)

Mit Hochdruck betriebener pneumatischer Getränkespender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de boissons pneumatique à pression surélevée

Publication

EP 1092673 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120507 A

Priority

EP 99120507 A

Abstract (en)

A self-contained high pressure pneumatic beverage dispensing system configured for portable or fixed installations. The beverage system is designed to dispense carbonated and noncarbonated mixed beverages, as well as any carbonated and noncarbonated unmixed beverages in liquid form. In particular, the self-contained pneumatic beverage dispensing system includes source of high pressure water, a source of high pressure CO2 gas, a carbonator tank, a tank water level switch, and a water valve. In a first embodiment, the source of pressurized water comprises a high pressure water tank containing water that is pressurized with CO2 gas. In a second embodiment, the source of pressurized water comprises a low pressure water tank, and a high pressure water pump that is used to raise the pressure of the water supplied by the low pressure water tank. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/00; B67D 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/00 (2006.01); B67D 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0057 (2013.01); B67D 1/0462 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092673 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030601

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI