Global Patent Index - EP 1092674 A1

EP 1092674 A1 2001-04-18 - Self-contained pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (en)

Self-contained pneumatic beverage dispensing system

Title (de)

Pneumatisch betriebener Getränkespender

Title (fr)

Distributeur de boissons autonome avec alimentation pneumatique

Publication

EP 1092674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99120508 A

Priority

EP 99120508 A

Abstract (en)

The present disclosure concerns a self-contained, pneumatic beverage dispensing system. In one embodiment, the pneumatic beverage dispensing system comprises a carbonator tank for facilitating absorption of CO2 gas in water to produce carbonated water, a source of CO2 gas under high pressure, the source of CO2 gas being in fluid communication with the carbonator tank so as to fill the carbonator tank with CO2 gas, and a source of water under high pressure, the source of water being in fluid communication with the carbonator tank so as to fill the carbonator tank with water. The system normally further comprises at least two liquid containers for containing liquids to be dispensed by the dispensing system, one of the liquid containers being in fluid communication with the source of CO2 gas, and a pneumatic pump system in fluid communication with the source of CO2 gas and the other of the liquid containers. In operation, the pneumatic pump system receives high pressure CO2 gas from the source of CO2 gas and uses it to pressurize air that is supplied to the other of the liquid containers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/04; F04B 9/135

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/04 (2006.01); B67D 1/08 (2006.01); B67D 1/10 (2006.01); F04B 9/135 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0462 (2013.01); B67D 1/0835 (2013.01); B67D 1/103 (2013.01); F04B 9/135 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092674 A1 20010418; EP 1211217 A1 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031223

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI