Global patent index - EP 1092760 A1

EP 1092760 A1 2001-04-18 - LUBRICANT FOR VAPOR COMPRESSION REFRIGERATOR USING HYDROCARBON COOLANT

Title (en)

LUBRICANT FOR VAPOR COMPRESSION REFRIGERATOR USING HYDROCARBON COOLANT

Title (de)

SCHMIERMITTEL FÜR DAMPFKOMPRESSIONSKÜHLSCHRANK MIT KOHLENWASSERSTOFFKÜHLMITTEL

Title (fr)

REFRIGERATEUR A COMPRESSION DE VAPEUR DANS LEQUEL UNE SUBSTANCE DE REFROIDISSEMENT HYDROCARBONEE EST UTILISEE

Publication

EP 1092760 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00909736 A

Priority

  • JP 0001675 W
  • JP 9667599 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a lubricant for a compression type refrigeration system using a lower hydrocarbon refrigerant, comprising as a main component a mineral oil having a kinematic viscosity at 40 DEG C of 3-150 mm<2>/s, a pour point of -25 DEG C or lower, a viscosity index of 50 or higher, %CP and %CA by n-d-M ring analysis of 50 or more and 12 or less, respectively, a nitrogen content of 20 ppm or lower, a sulfur content of 0.02-0.3% and an iodine value of 10 gI2/100g or lower, a working fluid composition for the refrigeration system comprising the lubricant and the lower hydrocarbon refrigerant comprising hydrocarbon compounds having 1-5 carbon atoms, and a refrigeration system is filled with the working fluid composition. Because of excellent compatibility with a hydrocarbon refrigerant and also excellent stability and lubricating properties, the lubricant of the present invention is very useful for the refrigeration system using the hydrocarbon refrigerant, which does not have the fear of ozone layer depletion and global warming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 101/02; C10M 129/10; C10M 137/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 171/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 101/02 (2013.01); C10M 171/008 (2013.01); C10M 2203/10 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/102 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/027 (2013.01); C10M 2207/042 (2013.01); C10M 2207/046 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/04 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 129/10 + C10M 129/14 + C10M 133/12

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092760 A1 20010418; EP 1092760 A4 20020731; EP 1092760 B1 20050209; CN 1183236 C 20050105; CN 1297472 A 20010530; DE 60018005 D1 20050317; DE 60018005 T2 20051229; ES 2233339 T3 20050616; JP 3933872 B2 20070620; WO 0060031 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2233339

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60018005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-03-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-07-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-07-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 10M 101/02 A, 7C 10M 169/04 B, 7C 10M 171/02 B, 7C 10M 171/00 B, 7C 10M 169/04 J, 7C 10M 101:02 J, 7C 10M 137:04 J, 7C 10M 129:10 J, 7C 10M 133:12 J, 7C 10N 30:02 Z, 7C 10N 40:30 Z

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT