Global Patent Index - EP 1092762 A1

EP 1092762 A1 2001-04-18 - Storage stable compositions comprising mediators, peroxide compounds and pH stabilizers, and their use in enzymatic bleaching systems

Title (en)

Storage stable compositions comprising mediators, peroxide compounds and pH stabilizers, and their use in enzymatic bleaching systems

Title (de)

Mediatoren, Peroxidverbindungen und pH-Stabilisatoren enthaltende lagerstabile Formulierungen und deren Verwendung in enzymatischen Bleichsystemen

Title (fr)

Compositions stables contenant des médiateurs, des composés péroxyde et des stabilisateurs de pH ainsi que leur utilisation dans des systèmes de blanchiment enzymatique

Publication

EP 1092762 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121206 A

Priority

DE 19948989 A

Abstract (en)

An aqueous formulation comprises (by wt.) : (a) a mediator (0.1-20%); (b) a peroxide compound (0.1-20%); and (c) an aqueous solution of a pH stabilizer (60-99.8%), with mediator (a) being a benzene ring-condensed N-heterocyclic compound and with the formulation being free of enzymes. Mediator (a) being a benzene ring-condensed N-heterocyclic compound of formula (I). M = H, alkali (especially Na or K), alkaline earth (especially Ca or Mg), ammonium or 1-4C alkyl- or alkanol-ammonium; R<1> - R<4> = H, halogen (especially F, Cl or Br), OH, formyl, amino, NO2, 1-12C alkyl, 1-6C alkoxy, carbonyl-1-6C alkyl, phenyl, benzyl, phenyloxy, -COOR<5>, -SO2OR<5>, -SO2NH2, -NHSO2, -CONH2, -PO(OR<5>)2, -PO2(OR<5>) or -OPO(OR<5>)2; X = -N=N-, (-N=CR<6>-)m, (-CR<6>=N-)m or (-CR<7>=CR<8>-)m; m = 1 or 2; R<5> = H, alkali (especially Na or K), alkaline earth (especially Ca or Mg), ammonium or 1-4C alkyl- or alkanol-ammonium, 1-18 (especially 3-10)C alkyl or -(CH2CH2O-)x; x = 1-25 (especially 3-15); and R<6> - R<8> = as for R<1> - R<4>

Abstract (de)

Bereitgestellt werden neue lagerstabile Formulierungen, die mindestens eine Peroxidverbindung, mindestens einen speziellen Mediator und mindestens einen pH-Stabilisator enthalten. Bevorzugt werden als Mediatoren Hydroxybenzotriazol-Derivate eingesetzt. Derartige lagerstabile Formulierungen können als Komponente in enzymatischen 2-Komponenten-Bleichsystemen eingesetzt werden, die insbesondere zur Entfernung überschüssigen Farbstoffs von gefärbten textilen Materialien nach einer Färbung dienen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/28; C11D 3/386; C11D 3/39; D06L 3/02; D06P 5/02; D06P 5/13; D06P 5/15; D21C 9/10; D21C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); D06P 5/02 (2006.01); D06P 5/13 (2006.01); D06P 5/15 (2006.01); D21C 5/00 (2006.01); D21C 9/10 (2006.01); D21C 9/16 (2006.01); D06P 1/642 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/132 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/38654 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); D06P 5/02 (2013.01); D06P 5/137 (2013.01); D06P 5/153 (2013.01); D06P 5/158 (2013.01); D21C 5/005 (2013.01); D21C 9/1036 (2013.01); D21C 9/163 (2013.01); D06P 1/6426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5376387 A 19941227 - MONTICELLO MICHAEL V [US]
  • [A] EP 0882814 A1 19981209 - CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]
  • [A] DE 19723912 A1 19981210 - CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND [DE]
  • [A] DATABASE CHEMABS [online] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US; KULYS, J.: "Exploring and modelling mediator-assisted peroxidase catalysis", XP002157750, retrieved from STN Database accession no. 132:75263 CA & BIOLOGIJA (1998), (4), 32-36BIOLOGIJA (1998), (4), 32-36

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092762 A1 20010418; EP 1092762 B1 20041208; DE 19948989 A1 20010523; US 6380142 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008895

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120929

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120929

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120929

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-11-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-03-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008895 P 20050113

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/28 A

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/39 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/386 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21C 9/10 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 21C 9/16 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 5/02 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 5/13 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06P 5/15 B

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7D 06L 3/02 B

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER CHEMICALS AG

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI