Global Patent Index - EP 1092783 A1

EP 1092783 A1 2001-04-18 - METHOD OF CANCER DIAGNOSIS BASED ON THE DETECTION OF CHROMOSOME ABNORMALITY

Title (en)

METHOD OF CANCER DIAGNOSIS BASED ON THE DETECTION OF CHROMOSOME ABNORMALITY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR KREBSDIAGNOSE AUF BASIS DES NACHWEISES VON CHROMOSOMENABNORMALITÄTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC DU CANCER FONDE SUR LA DETECTION D'ANOMALIES CHROMOSOMIQUES

Publication

EP 1092783 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98938949 A

Priority

  • JP 9803733 W
  • JP 4355198 A
  • JP 16952298 A

Abstract (en)

It has now been revealed that, in the chromosomes of cells of meningioma, glioma, pituitary adenoma, biliary region carcinoma, ovarian clear cell adenocarcinoma, non-clear cell adenocarcinoma, corpus uteri cancer, hepatocellular carcinoma, stomach cancer, esophageal squamous cell carcinoma or oral squamous cell carcinoma, there is amplifications or deletions of DNA in the regions specific for each cancer. The present invention provides a method for diagnosing cancers by detecting the amplification or deletion in chromosome regions which are specific for each of the above cancers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6886 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6841 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/112 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092783 A1 20010418; EP 1092783 A4 20041103; CA 2321986 A1 19990902; WO 9943196 A2 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041207

2004-11-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-04-28 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2004-04-14 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000922

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE