Global Patent Index - EP 1092784 A1

EP 1092784 A1 2001-04-18 - Assembling device for lining a converter

Title (en)

Assembling device for lining a converter

Title (de)

Montagevorrichtung zur Auskleidung eines Konverters

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage pour le revêtement d'un convertisseur

Publication

EP 1092784 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113465 A

Priority

DE 19950056 A

Abstract (en)

Assembly has a structure (30) fixed to one end in the opening region (12) of a converter (10) and protruding in the fixed position into the converter with the second end. At least one arm (32, 34) is hinged on the structure, the arm having a gripping device (32.7) for at least one brick. Preferred Features: The arm and/or the gripping device can be moved in all directions of the coordinate system. The arm is arranged on the second end of the structure protruding into the converter.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Montageeinrichtung zur Auskleidung eines Konverters. Die Montagevorrichtung umfaßt ein Gerüst, welches im Bereich der Konverteröffnung in den Konverter eingehängt wird. An diesem Gerüst wird ein Montagearm mit Greifeinrichtung angelenkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21C 5/44; F27D 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/44 (2006.01); F27D 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/1621 (2013.01); C21C 5/441 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 4240676 C1 19940818 - LOEWE INDUSTRIEOFENBAU GMBH [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 08 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 470 (C - 0990) 30 September 1992 (1992-09-30)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Week 198740, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 1987-280448, XP002158009, "Apparatus for installing brick into steel converter"
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 156 (C - 351) 5 June 1986 (1986-06-05)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092784 A1 20010418; CA 2316505 A1 20010416; DE 19950056 A1 20010503; DE 19950056 C2 20010823

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI