Global Patent Index - EP 1092792 A1

EP 1092792 A1 2001-04-18 - Spinnerette assembly of a wet spinning installation

Title (en)

Spinnerette assembly of a wet spinning installation

Title (de)

Spinndüsenvorrichtung einer Nasspinneinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filière d'une installation pour filage au mouillé

Publication

EP 1092792 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121728 A

Priority

DE 19949399 A

Abstract (en)

A spinneret assembly supported from the hollow wall (3) of the spin bath is fitted with a coiled tube (23) to control the temperature of the spinneret (7). With a typical spin bath temperature of 0 to 80 degrees C and spinning solution fed through a connection (17) at -5 to +30 degrees C, cooling fluid (24) is fed to the coil (23) to prevent excessive spinneret temperatures.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Spinndüsenvorrichtung 4 einer Naßspinneinrichtung zum Einbringen einer Spinnlösung in ein Spinnbad bei der Herstellung eines Fadens. Die Spinndüsenvorrichtung 4 weist eine Temperiereinrichtung 20 auf, die zweckmäßigerweise in einem Düsentragteil 5 der Spinndüsenvorrichtung 4 angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/06; D01D 1/06; D01D 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 1/06 (2006.01); D01D 4/00 (2006.01); D01D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/06 (2013.01); D01D 1/06 (2013.01); D01D 4/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092792 A1 20010418; DE 19949399 A1 20010510; PL 194264 B1 20070531; PL 343058 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20101118

2007-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040302

2007-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER ANGEWAN

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DERANGEWAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI