Global Patent Index - EP 1092794 A1

EP 1092794 A1 2001-04-18 - Yarn draw-off nozzle for an open-end spinning machine

Title (en)

Yarn draw-off nozzle for an open-end spinning machine

Title (de)

Fadenabzugsdüse fur eine Offenend-Rotorspinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Tuyère de sortie de fil pour un métier à filer à bout libre

Publication

EP 1092794 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119747 A

Priority

DE 19949533 A

Abstract (en)

The draw-off tube (10) has a recess so that the yarn loses contact with the surface for at least 10 degrees as it swings round in its path from the rotor groove to the hole (32) through which it is drawn off. The recess is formed by a wedge shaped step with a depth (29) of 1 to 3 mm that extends for an angle ( alpha ) of 15 to 25 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Offenend-Rotorspinnvorrichtung mit einer Fadenabzugsdüse (10), durch die der Faden aus seiner Einbindezone innerhalb des Spinnrotors abgezogen und während des Umlaufs auf der Fadenabzugsdüse (10) unter zusätzlicher Ausbildung von Falschdraht rollend umgelenkt wird, wobei die Fadenabzugsdüse eine in Umlaufrichtung des Fadens abrupt abgesetzte Vertiefung (24) aufweist, durch die der Faden im wesentlichen über die gesamte Umlenkstrecke in Abzugsrichtung des Fadens und über einen Winkelbereich von mindestens 10° den Kontakt zur Fadenabzugsdüse (10) verliert. Der Falschdraht wird jeweils beim Überstreichen dieser Zone vollständig unterbrochen und der Drallstau des Fadens an der Fadenabzugsdüse (10) aufgehoben. Garne, die mit diesen Fadenabzugsdüsen (10) ersponnen werden, weisen eine lockere Garnstruktur mit deutlich verminderter Umwindefaseranzahl auf und ermöglichen den Einsatz von Rotorgarnen in Anwendungsbereichen, in denen vorzugsweise voluminöse und weiche Garne verarbeitet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092794 A1 20010418; EP 1092794 B1 20031217; DE 19949533 A1 20010419; US 6269623 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050911

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004778 P 20040129

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI