Global Patent Index - EP 1092805 A2

EP 1092805 A2 2001-04-18 - Calender

Title (en)

Calender

Title (de)

Kalander

Title (fr)

Calandre

Publication

EP 1092805 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117873 A

Priority

DE 19944089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19944089C1] The calender assembly, to process both sides of a web, and especially of paper, has two separate roller stacks (2,3). The two roller stack axes (A,B) are at a gap from each other, in relation to a crossing point (K), so that the roller nip (12) next to the crossing point (K) at one roller stack (2,3) is closer to the crossing point (K) than the nip (15) against the crossing point (K) in the other roller stack (3,2). The two roller stacks (2,3) are deployed in a V-shape layout, as an upright or an inverted V-shape. The two roller stacks (2,3) form an included angle of <= 120 deg between their stack axes (A,B). The larger gap of the other roller stack (2,3) is set so that a web path between them can be shortened selectively. The two roller stacks (2,3) contain hard (4,6,9,11) and soft (5,7,8,10) rollers, with gaps between the hard and soft rollers. The two roller stacks (2,3) contain identical rollers, in a reverse order in relation to the direction (D) of web travel through the calender assembly, with four rollers in each stack (2,3). The rollers in one stack (2,3) can have different diameters. All the rollers within each stack (2,3) have their own drives.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Kalander für die zweiseitige Behandlung einer Warenbahn, insbesondere einer Papierbahn, mit einer Walzenanordnung aus zwei entgegengesetzt zueinander und gegen die Horizontale geneigt angeordneten Walzenstapeln mit einer wählbaren Anzahl entlang einer Walzenstapelachse angeordneten Walzen und zwischen den Walzen ausgebildeten Arbeitsspalten, die die Warenbahn in einer Durchlaufrichtung durchläuft. Um die Bahnführung in einem Kalander mit zwei geneigt angeordneten Walzenstapeln jeweils von unten nach oben zu ermöglichen, und zwar bei billigerer Anschaffung und kostengünstigerem Betrieb, ist vorgesehen, daß die zwei Walzenstapel (2,3) getrennt arbeitend angeordnet und gegenüber einem Kreuzungspunkt (K) der beiden Walzenstapelachsen (A,B) derart zueinander beabstandet sind, daß zur Verkürzung einer Bahnführung zwischen den zwei Walzenstapeln ein dem Kreuzungspunkt nächstliegender Nip (12,17) des einen Walzenstapels mit einem kleineren Abstand zu dem Kreuzungspunkt angeordnet ist als ein dem Kreuzungspunkt nächstliegender Nip (15,14) des anderen Walzenstapels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19944089 C1 20001130; EP 1092805 A2 20010418; EP 1092805 A3 20010718; EP 1092805 B1 20040707

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007005

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130819

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070819

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070819

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-08-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060817

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-04-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007005 P 20040812

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2002-05-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI