Global Patent Index - EP 1092810 A2

EP 1092810 A2 2001-04-18 - Device to fix a tap to a household object and/or to a sanitary fixture

Title (en)

Device to fix a tap to a household object and/or to a sanitary fixture

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Wasserhahnes an einem Haushalts- und/oder Sanitärobjekt

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un robinet à un meuble et/ou un objet sanitaire

Publication

EP 1092810 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00120970 A

Priority

IT MI992145 A

Abstract (en)

A device to fix easily a tap(7) to a household object comprises an anchor body (1) suitable to pass from a vertical to a horizontal position; a metal wire (4), integral with the tap (7) and inserted in a sheath (5) relatively to which the metal wire (4) slides, and tightening means to tight the metal wire (4). In order to set working the tap (7) , the anchor body (1) -in a vertical position- and the metal wire (4) are inserted in a hole in the household; tensioning the metal wire (4) the anchor body (1) goes in a horizontal position and blocks the tap. the tension of the metal wire (4) generating on the sheath (5) a thrust which brings the anchor body (1) in a horizontal position and presses it against the household object so blocking the tap. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/0401 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092810 A2 20010418; EP 1092810 A3 20020612; EP 1092810 B1 20040623; DE 60011728 D1 20040729; IT 1313945 B1 20020926; IT MI992145 A1 20010416; IT MI992145 D0 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-09-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040924

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60011728

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2004-06-23 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2004-06-23 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040623

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI