Global Patent Index - EP 1092812 A1

EP 1092812 A1 2001-04-18 - Toilet seat

Title (en)

Toilet seat

Title (de)

Toilettensitz

Title (fr)

Siège de toilette

Publication

EP 1092812 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120381 A

Priority

EP 99120381 A

Abstract (en)

The lavatory seat (1) has an integrated air cleaning system, to deodorize the air from within the toilet bowl. The interior of the seat (1) is hollow (4) to hold an ionizing unit (8). A fan (7) is fitted to the seat wall, to draw air in from the bowl zone through air inflow openings (5), to be ionized and expelled through an outflow opening (6) into the ambient environment. The ionizing unit (8) has two facing electrodes.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft einen Toilettensitz (1). Um einen gattungsgemäßen Toilettensitz (1) dahingehend weiterzubilden, daß ein Freisetzen von unangenehmen Geruchsstoffen während einer Benutzung der Toilette weitestgehend verhindert wird, wird mit der Erfindung ein im Toilettensitz (1) integriertes Luftreinigungssystem zur Reinigung der sich im Innenraum des Toilettenkörpers befindlichen Luft vorgeschlagen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/052; A47K 13/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 13/30 (2006.01); E03D 9/052 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/052 (2013.01); A47K 13/307 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092812 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031122

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030530

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI