Global Patent Index - EP 1092815 A1

EP 1092815 A1 2001-04-18 - Fire-resistant partition

Title (en)

Fire-resistant partition

Title (de)

Feuerbeständige Trennwand

Title (fr)

Cloison coupe-feu

Publication

EP 1092815 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402841 A

Priority

FR 9912913 A

Abstract (en)

Fireproof wall of high height has a part integral with the upper roof (2a) and a part integral with the lower floor (2b). The superior part (1) has a sheet (11) folded and opened in the inferior end in which the inferior part (3) can slide. The inferior part is made of metallic vertical posts (4) surrounding a core of fire-resistant material (7) and covered by plaster sheets (6). The upper part is made of metallic structure linked with the sheet and the roof and coated with plaster.

Abstract (fr)

Cloison coupe-feu de grande hauteur comprenant des panneaux de parement résistant au feu, disposés de part et d'autre d'une ossature métallique, ladite cloison comportant une première partie et une seconde partie aptes à coulisser l'une par rapport à l'autre de sorte à accommoder les déformations relatives du plancher haut (2a) par rapport au plancher bas (2b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7411 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092815 A1 20010418; EP 1092815 A4 20001228; FR 2799779 A1 20010420; FR 2799779 B1 20020111; WO 0129340 A1 20010426; WO 0129340 A8 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050503

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VINCI CONSTRUCTION GRANDS PROJETS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMPENON BERNARD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI