Global Patent Index - EP 1092817 A2

EP 1092817 A2 2001-04-18 - Improved formwork for the construction of floors, roofings and the like

Title (en)

Improved formwork for the construction of floors, roofings and the like

Title (de)

Verbessertes Schalungselement für die Herstellung von Decken, Dächern und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Coffrage amélioré pour la réalisation de dalles, toitures, etc...

Publication

EP 1092817 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119093 A

Priority

IT PN990041 U

Abstract (en)

Formwork for containing a concrete casting, adapted to form the resting surface for a floor, roofing or similar structure of a building. The formwork is made up by stool-shaped elements (15) which are moulded out of plastic material and are joined to each other by allowing their side edges to overlap, while leaving vertical cavities (16) open between contiguous elements. These cavities are then closed on top by means of stoppage elements (18) adapted to prevent the cast concrete from penetrating them. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/48; E04F 15/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/36 (2006.01); E04B 5/48 (2006.01); E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/48 (2013.01); E04B 5/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092817 A2 20010418; EP 1092817 A3 20010822; IT 248147 Y1 20021210; IT PN990041 U1 20010412; IT PN990041 V0 19991012

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050112

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011215

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI