Global Patent Index - EP 1092820 A2

EP 1092820 A2 2001-04-18 - Awning

Title (en)

Awning

Title (de)

Markise

Title (fr)

Marquise

Publication

EP 1092820 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118938 A

Priority

DE 19949215 A

Abstract (en)

The awning or blind is designed so that the valance fabric shaft (15) is driven by an electric motor (17) fed with current from an electric accumulator (18). The electric motor (17) is arranged in the drop tube (12). The electric motor (17) is switched on by a remote control. Solar cells (19) are fitted at the drop tube (12), for charging the accumulator (18). Contacts (20) of a charging cable of the accumulator are fitted at the drop tube (12), which with the travelling in of the drop tube (12) come in to contact with the charge contacts (21) of a voltage source.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Markise, insbesondere Gelenkarmmarkise, mit einem Ausfallrohr an der vorderen Stirnkante der Markise, wobei an oder in dem Ausfallrohr eine Volant-Tuchwelle mit einem Volant-Markisentuch angeordnet ist, um das Volant-Markisentuch zur Schaffung eines im wesentlichen vertikalen Sonnen- bzw. Sichtschutzes in Richtung auf den Boden ausfahren zu können, ist vorgesehen, daß die Volant-Tuchwelle (15) mittels eines aus einem Akkumulator (18) gespeisten Elektromotors (17) angetrieben ist. Insbesondere ist vorgesehen, daß an dem Ausfallrohr (12) Kontakte (20) eines Ladekabels des Akkus (18) angebracht sind, die beim Einfahren des Ausfallrohrs (12) in Kontakt mit Ladekontakten (21) einer Spannungsquelle gelangen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 10/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/04 (2006.01); E04F 10/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 10/0644 (2013.01); E04F 10/0696 (2013.01); E06B 9/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092820 A2 20010418; EP 1092820 A3 20020306; DE 19949215 A1 20010419; JP 2001123620 A 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI