Global Patent Index - EP 1092822 A1

EP 1092822 A1 2001-04-18 - Protective lining for building surfaces

Title (en)

Protective lining for building surfaces

Title (de)

Schutzbahn zum Abdecken von Bauwerksflächen

Title (fr)

Couverture de protection pour surfaces de bâtiments

Publication

EP 1092822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00122408 A

Priority

DE 29918159 U

Abstract (en)

The cover material (1), to protect surfaces at construction sites, is a woven material of polypropylene film ribbons (10,11) with a shear strength of at least 450 N/5 cm. The rear surface (2) of the material is treated by a corona or plasma to increase the adhesion of the adhesive. The treated rear surface is coated with a dispersion adhesive (3) based on acrylic acid ester coploymerizate, spread at a rate of 12-35 g/cm<2> in a dot screen pattern.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine diffusionsoffene Schutzbahn zum vorübergehenden Abdecken von Bauwerksflächen wie Böden, Treppen, Wänden im Innenbereich und Außenbereich von Bauwerken, aus einem Gewebe (1) aus Kunststoffbändchen (10,11), das auf der an der Bauwerksfläche zum Anliegen kommenden Rückseite (2) mit einem von der Bauwerksfläche wieder lösbaren Kleber (3) beschichtet ist, wobei daß das Gewebe (1) aus Polypropylenfolienbändchen (10,11), die eine Reißfestigkeit von mindestens 450 N/5 cm aufweisen, gewebt ist und die Rückseite des Gewebes (1) zur Erhöhung der Haftung des Klebers mittels Corona oder Plasma vorbehandelt ist und auf der vorbehandelten Rückseite eine Selbstklebeschicht aus einem Dispersionskleber auf Basis eines Acrylsäureestercopolymerisates mit einem Flächengewicht (trocken) von 12 bis 35 g/m<2> aufgebracht ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/30 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29918159 U1 20000105; EP 1092822 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041109

2004-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2003-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRIMUS BAUSYSTEME GMBH

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI