Global Patent Index - EP 1092829 A2

EP 1092829 A2 2001-04-18 - Drive device for a door

Title (en)

Drive device for a door

Title (de)

Antriebseinrichtung für eine Tür

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement pour une porte

Publication

EP 1092829 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122101 A

Priority

DE 19949744 A

Abstract (en)

The building door actuator (3) has a drive motor (31) to close the door and an energy reservoir coil spring to open the door. The reservoir (34) is primed as the door is closed and some of the energy is reused to open the door. The reservoir has an emergency opening control with an electrically operated lock (33) to retain the door closed. The lock can be released by an electrical signal so that the door can be opened. Claims include a method for operating the door

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Antriebseinrichtung (1) mit Notöffnungsvorrichtung für eine Tür mit Drehflügel (2) beschrieben. Bekannte Antriebseinrichtungen verwenden zur Notöffnung mechanische Kupplungen welche automatisch oder manuell ausgelöst werden müssen. Die neue Antriebseinrichtung (1) soll einfacher aufgebaut sein und automatisch arbeiten. Das Öffnen des Drehflügels (2) erfolgt selbsttätig über einen Energiespeicher (34) und das Schließen motorisch unter Fremdenergiezufuhr, wobei der Energiespeicher (34) geladen wird. Zum Halten des Drehflügels ist eine elektrisch schaltbare Haltevorrichtung (33) vorgesehen, die von einer Steuervorrichtung (5) ausgelöst wird. Im Notfall öffnet sich der Drehflügel (2) selbsttätig unter Wirkung des Energiespeichers (34). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/04; E05F 3/22; E05F 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 1/10 (2006.01); E05F 3/10 (2006.01); E05F 3/22 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2015.01); E05F 15/04 (2006.01); E05F 15/20 (2006.01); E05F 15/53 (2015.01); E05F 15/72 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 3/102 (2013.01); E05F 3/223 (2013.01); E05F 3/224 (2013.01); E05F 15/53 (2013.01); E05F 15/72 (2013.01); E05F 1/1091 (2013.01); E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/216 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/232 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/246 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/41 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/422 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/448 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/462 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/45 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/80 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/113 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092829 A2 20010418; EP 1092829 A3 20050831; EP 1092829 B1 20160706; DE 19949744 A1 20010419; DE 19949744 B4 20140522

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-05-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ASSA ABLOY ENTRANCE SYSTEMS AB

- Effective date: 20170406

2017-04-06 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 50016449

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161107

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161007

2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-01-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160706

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-09 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20160706

2016-08-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016449

2016-07-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2016-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-07-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 810854 T

- Effective date: 20160715

2016-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2016-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-03-16 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160219

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/00 20150101ALI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 1/10 20060101AFI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 3/22 20060101ALI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/72 20150101ALI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 15/53 20150101ALI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05F 3/10 20060101ALI20151214BHEP

2015-12-14 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 50016449

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E05F0015040000

- IPC: E05F0001100000

2007-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070314

2006-05-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-08-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DAISS, STEFAN

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI