Global Patent Index - EP 1092831 A2

EP 1092831 A2 2001-04-18 - A security closure for windows and doors

Title (en)

A security closure for windows and doors

Title (de)

Sicherheitsverschluss für Fenster und Türen

Title (fr)

Fermeture de sécurité pour fenêtres et portes

Publication

EP 1092831 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122047 A

Priority

DE 19948987 A

Abstract (en)

The lock for a building door or window with a security grill (1) has a bolt (4) attached to the grill and which extends through a matching opening (8) in the door or window leaf when the grill is in the closed position. The bolt can extend through the door or window leaf opening into an area behind the door or window to be retained by a locking pin.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Schutzgitter für Fenster und Türen mit einer Verriegelungsvorrichtung, aufweisend wenigstens einen an dem Schutzgitter angebrachten Riegel, der in der Schließstellung des Schutzgitters am Mauerwerk befestigt ist, beschrieben. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Riegel (4) derart geformt, dass er in der Schließstellung des Schutzgitters (1) in eine entsprechende Öffnung (8) des Fensters oder der Türe (2), das bzw. die sich in der Geschlossenstellung oder der Kippstellung befinden, hineinragt. Vorzugsweise ragt der Riegel (4) in der Schließstellung des Schutzgitters (1) durch die entsprechende Öffnung (8) des Fensters oder der Türe (2), das bzw. die sich in der Geschlossenstellung oder der Kippstellung befinden, in den Bereich hinter dem Fenster oder der Türe (2) hinein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8909135 U1 19891012

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092831 A2 20010418; EP 1092831 A3 20030514; DE 19948987 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: AL

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: LT

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: LV

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: MK

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: RO

2004-02-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20031114

- Countries: SI

2004-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/01 A

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 65/10 B

2003-05-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 06B 9/02 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI