Global Patent Index - EP 1092836 A2

EP 1092836 A2 2001-04-18 - Boring device with a cutting wheel having high pressure nozzles

Title (en)

Boring device with a cutting wheel having high pressure nozzles

Title (de)

Bohrvorrichtung mit einem Schneidrad mit Hochdruckdüsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de forage à roue coupante avec buses à haute pression

Publication

EP 1092836 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810926 A

Priority

CH 184799 A

Abstract (en)

The drill has a cutting wheel with one end facing the mine face during drilling and on which are mounted a number of mining tools (14) and which has high pressure nozzles (15) between the mining tools that direct high pressure jets of liquid towards the mine face during drilling. The pressure achievable with the jets is at least 100 mbar, preferably at least 250 mbar. Independent claims are also included for the following: a method of mining material with a drill.

Abstract (de)

Eine Bohrvorrichtung umfasst ein Schneidrad (1), das eine während des Bohrbetriebs der Ortsbrust des abzubauenden Materials zugewandte Stirnseite aufweist. An der Stirnseite des Schneidrads (1) sind an Schneidradarmen (11, 111) eine Vielzahl von Schälmessern (14) angebracht. Zwischen den Schälmessern (14) sind Hochdruckdüsen (15) angeordnet, die während des Bohrbetriebs jeweils einen Flüssigkeitsstrahl mit Hochdruck auf die Ortsbrust richten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/10; E21D 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/08 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/1066 (2013.01); E21D 9/0879 (2016.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4206831 C2 19960912 - OHBAYASHI CORP [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092836 A2 20010418; EP 1092836 A3 20031126

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-01-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21D 9/08 A

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI