Global Patent Index - EP 1092841 A1

EP 1092841 A1 2001-04-18 - Valve seal

Title (en)

Valve seal

Title (de)

Ventilschaftabdichtung

Title (fr)

Joint de queue de soupape

Publication

EP 1092841 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115709 A

Priority

DE 19949248 A

Abstract (en)

The valve shaft seal has an elastomer sealing element (2) with spring-loaded sealing lip and reinforcement ring. The sealing element is positioned against the end face (6) of the valve shaft guide (5) and preferably has an axial ring face (7) for bearing against same. the reinforcement ring seen in longitudinal section has an angular or S-shape with the inwardly aligned arm (12) lying at the transition to the sealing lip and enclosed by the elastomer material.

Abstract (de)

Ventilschaftabdichtung an Verbrennungskraftmaschinen für Fahrzeuge mit auf die Ventilschaftführung aufgesetzten und daran positionierten elastomerem Dichtelement mit am Ventilschaft anliegender federbelasteter Dichtlippe und einem das Dichtelement einfassenden Versteifungsring, wobei die Positionierung des Dichtelements (2) an der Stirnfläche (6) der Ventilschaftführung (5) erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092841 A1 20010418; DE 19949248 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20050211

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031103

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL FREUDENBERG KG

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI