Global Patent Index - EP 1092850 A2

EP 1092850 A2 2001-04-18 - Outboard motor

Title (en)

Outboard motor

Title (de)

Aussenbordmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur hors-bord

Publication

EP 1092850 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00122172 A

Priority

  • JP 29227699 A
  • JP 28903099 A

Abstract (en)

Internal combustion engine, in particular a four-stroke cycle engine with a vertical crankshaft and a lateral cylinder, wherein oil passages are formed in the side walls of a cylinder body and a cylinder head to make fluid communication with a valve drive chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 61/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 11/02 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F01M 9/10 (2006.01); F02B 61/04 (2006.01); F02B 75/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F01M 11/02 (2013.01); F02F 7/0019 (2013.01); F01M 9/10 (2013.01); F02B 61/045 (2013.01); F02B 75/007 (2013.01); F02B 2075/027 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FI FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092850 A2 20010418; EP 1092850 A3 20020417; EP 1092850 B1 20060419

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101012

2011-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *YAMAHA MARINE K.K.

- Effective date: 20101031

2010-08-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-08-04 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20100720

2010-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091007

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091017

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20091014

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070122

2006-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT NL

2006-04-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060419

2005-11-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: OUTBOARD MOTOR

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050517

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YAMAHA MARINE KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2003-02-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE FI FR GB IT NL

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02B 61/04 A, 7F 02F 7/00 B, 7F 01M 11/02 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE FI FR GB IT NL

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI