Global Patent Index - EP 1092858 A2

EP 1092858 A2 2001-04-18 - Method and device for controlling an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method and device for controlling an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la commande d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1092858 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120364 A

Priority

DE 19948971 A

Abstract (en)

The internal combustion engine control method involves detecting (140) the pressure in a pressure reservoir into which at least one pump delivers fuel. A correction value (K) for the pressure sensor signal is derived from the filtered sensor signal. A first sensor signal (PT) is detected at fixed time intervals and a second sensor signal (PN) at fixed angular intervals. The first signal is filtered and the second is corrected. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for controlling an internal combustion engine.

Abstract (de)

Es werden ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine, insbesondere einer Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Common-Rail-System, beschrieben. Eine Pumpe fördert Kraftstoff in einen Druckspeicher. Ein Sensorsignal, das den Kraftstoffdruck im Druckspeicher charakterisiert, wird erfaßt. Ausgehend von einem gefilterten Sensorsignal ist ein Korrekturwert zur Korrektur des Sensorsignals vorgebbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/22; F02D 41/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/32 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/222 (2013.01); F02D 41/3836 (2013.01); F02D 41/3845 (2013.01); F02D 41/3863 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1432 (2013.01); F02D 2041/223 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0602 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092858 A2 20010418; EP 1092858 A3 20020703; EP 1092858 B1 20051130; DE 19948971 A1 20010419; DE 50011741 D1 20060105; JP 2001132499 A 20010515; US 6446605 B1 20020910

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140916

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011741 P 20060105

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI