Global Patent Index - EP 1092860 A2

EP 1092860 A2 2001-04-18 - Carburettor and power tool

Title (en)

Carburettor and power tool

Title (de)

Vergaser und Motorwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Carburateur et outil motorisé

Publication

EP 1092860 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121410 A

Priority

US 41756299 A

Abstract (en)

The carburetor (26), for an internal combustion motor, has a choke (30) and a throttle (32), each operated by controls. The throttle control has two contact zones. The first contact zone works with the choke control, so that the throttle control can be held in a starting position when the choke is operated. The second contact zone works with the choke control so that it is held in a set position when the throttle is fully opened.

Abstract (de)

Vergaser an Motorwerkzeugen weisen häufig Gemischanreicherungssysteme auf, die durch eine Bedienungsperson zum Anlassen des Motorwerkzeugs betätigt werden. Bei bekannten Vergasern, Anreicherungseinrichtungen und Motorwerkzeugen besteht die Gefahr einer unsachgemäßen Handhabung, die dazu führen kann, daß ein Anlassen erschwert bzw. ein Betrieb unterbunden wird. Es wird ein Vergaser (26, 100) vorgeschlagen, der mit einer Anreicherungseinrichtung (30, 30', 102) und einer Drosseleinrichtung (32, 32') wirksam verbundene Steuerelemente (56, 68) aufweist, die derart zusammenwirken können, daß die Handhabung vereinfacht und die Funktion des Vergasers (26, 100) verbessert wird. Darüber hinaus wird ein Motorwerkzeug (10) mit einem solchen Vergaser (26, 100) vorgeschlagen. Vergaser und Motorwerkzeuge werden beispielsweise in der Garten-, Rasen- bzw. Grundstückspflege eingesetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4123480 A 19781031 - JOHANSSON ROLF A G

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092860 A2 20010418; EP 1092860 A3 20020424; EP 1092860 B1 20051123; AU 6543500 A 20010426; AU 764077 B2 20030807; CA 2301678 A1 20010414; CA 2301678 C 20041130; DE 50011679 D1 20051229; US 6494439 B1 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-05-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150929

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011679 P 20051229

2005-12-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-05-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHTRONIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD.

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI