Global patent index - EP 1092864 A2

EP 1092864 A2 2001-04-18 - Holder for an injector

Title (en)

Holder for an injector

Title (de)

Halterung für eine Einspritzdüse

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le maintien d'un injecteur

Publication

EP 1092864 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00119246 A

Priority

DE 19949080 A

Abstract (en)

The mounting for an injection jet, and especially in a direct fuel injection system for an internal combustion motor, has a clamp (16) which grips the body (11) of the injection jet (9). The clamp has a residual tension at the first end section(12), with a defined force in the axial direction (A) against the injection jet (9), to hold it in place in the drilling (14) through the cylinder head (2) of the motor (1). The second end section (13) works with a second drilling (15) of the air intake system, pref. with an intermediate sleeve.

Abstract (de)

Diese Halterung für eine Einspritzdüse eignet sich insbesondere für Brennkraftmaschinen mit Direkteinspritzung. Die Einspritzdüse (9) weist einen Düsenkörper (11) auf, dessen zylindrische erste und zweiten Endstücke (12,13) mit ersten und zweiten Bohrungen (14,15) von Komponenten der Brennkraftmaschine zusammenwirken. Zur einfachen Montage und systemdichten Festlegung der Einspritzdüse greift am Düsenkörper eine Spanneinrichtung (16) an, die das erste Endstück (12) mit definierter Vorspannung in der ersten Bohrung (14) eines Zylinderkopfs (2) in Lage hält. Dabei arbeitet das zweite Endstück (13) vorzugsweise unter Vermittlung einer Zwischenhülse (17) mit der zweiten Bohrung (15) einer Sauganlage (3) zusammen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 69/04; F02M 35/10; F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/14 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/145 (2013.01); F02M 35/10072 (2013.01); F02M 35/10216 (2013.01); F02M 35/10288 (2013.01); F02M 69/465 (2013.01); F02M 35/10137 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092864 A2 20010418; EP 1092864 A3 20040114; EP 1092864 B1 20050713; DE 19949080 A1 20010419; DE 19949080 B4 20051117; ES 2241533 T3 20051101; JP 2001132581 A 20010515; US 6708672 B1 20040323

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150903

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080907

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080908

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080906

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080908

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080906

2009-07-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080906

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060418

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2005-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2241533

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50010700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-07-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-07-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040823

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2004-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040714

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 69/04 A

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 61/14 B

2004-01-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7F 02M 35/10 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI