Global Patent Index - EP 1092869 A2

EP 1092869 A2 2001-04-18 - Drive system with a hydraulic piston machine

Title (en)

Drive system with a hydraulic piston machine

Title (de)

Antriebssytem mit einer hydraulischen Kolbenmaschine

Title (fr)

Système de propulsion avec machine hydraulique à piston

Publication

EP 1092869 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118401 A

Priority

DE 19949177 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle drive system (1) has a hydraulic piston motor (2) and a clutch (31), operated (35) selectively to engage/disengage the motor (2) and drive shaft (11). The displacement vol. of the piston motor (2) is adjusted by a setting unit (23), and the setting is registered by a monitor (33) which establishes the position of at least the min. displacement vol. The clutch operating system (35) is activated so that the clutch (31) is opened on detection of the min. displacement vol., and closed when the monitor (23) registers a displacement vol. above the min. level. The monitor (33) has a feeler mechanism (36) to register the position of the moving part (6) of the setting system (23), using a pin (37) moving within a guide hole (37a) through the peripheral wall (4d) of the motor housing (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Antriebssystem (1) mit einer hydraulischen Kolbenmaschine (2) und einer lösbaren Kupplung (31) zum wahlweisen Trennen einer Triebwelle (11) der Kolbenmaschine (2), die durch ein Betätigungsmittel (35) betätigbar ist. Das Verdrängungsvolumen der Kolbenmaschine (2) ist durch eine Einstellvorrichtung (23) einstellbar und es ist eine Erfassungsvorrichtung (33) vorgesehen, die die Stellung der Einstellvorrichtung (23) zumindest im Bereich minimalen Verdrängungsvolumens erfaßt und das Betätigungsmittel (35) so aktiviert, daß es die Kupplung (31) öffnet, wenn die Einstellvorrichtung (23) sich im Bereich minimalen Verdrängungsvolumens befindet, und die Kupplung (31) schließt, wenn die Einstellvorrichtung (23) sich außerhalb des Bereichs minimalen Verdrängungsvolumens befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/0686 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092869 A2 20010418; EP 1092869 A3 20030115; EP 1092869 B1 20061122; DE 19949177 A1 20010613; DE 19949177 C2 20020418; DE 50013767 D1 20070104

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013767

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120825

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120824

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-05-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013767 P 20070104

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI