Global Patent Index - EP 1092871 A2

EP 1092871 A2 2001-04-18 - Hollow swash plate compressor piston with bores

Title (en)

Hollow swash plate compressor piston with bores

Title (de)

Taumelscheibenkompressorhohlkolben mit Bohrungen

Title (fr)

Piston creux d'un compresseur à plateau en biais avec alésages

Publication

EP 1092871 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00119744 A

Priority

JP 29055099 A

Abstract (en)

A unilateral-headed swash plate type compressor, in which a body 19a of a piston 19 in sliding contact with the inner peripheral surface of a cylinder bore 1a is formed with a cavity 19a for realizing a reduced weight and also formed with an annular groove 42 fitted with a piston ring 41 in sliding contact with the inner peripheral surface of the cylinder bore 1a, is disclosed. The body 19c of the piston 19 includes at least a first hole 46 and at least a second hole 48 open to the inner peripheral surface of the cylinder bore 1a and communicating with the crank chamber 8 through the cavity 19a. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0878 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092871 A2 20010418; EP 1092871 A3 20031126; JP 2001107852 A 20010417

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040804

2004-08-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000909

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI