Global Patent Index - EP 1092875 A1

EP 1092875 A1 2001-04-18 - Self cleaning household pump

Title (en)

Self cleaning household pump

Title (de)

Selbstreinigende Haushaltspumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe domestique autonettoyante

Publication

EP 1092875 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402806 A

Priority

FR 9912706 A

Abstract (en)

Pump has a strainer (8) with an opening for the exit of fluid from the discharge chamber (6) and a part (14) comprising nozzles (18) which can be fixed in varied positions under the strainer.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une pompe comprenant une crépine (8) avec une ouverture pour la sortie de fluide provenant de la chambre de refoulement (6), et une pièce (14) montée sous la crépine présentant des ajutages (18) d'éjection du fluide provenant de la chambre de refoulement. Le fluide éjecté permet le nettoyage des alentours de la pompe. La pièce (14) est susceptible d'être montée en au moins deux positions; dans une position, l'ouverture est libérée, et la fonction de nettoyage est active. Dans une autre position, l'ouverture est obturée par un téton (26), et la fonction de nettoyage est inactive. L'invention permet un montage simple de la pompe dans des configurations avec ou sans nettoyage, par simple changement de la position de la pièce (14) par rapport à la crépine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 7/04; F04D 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 7/04 (2006.01); F04D 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 7/045 (2013.01); F04D 13/086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092875 A1 20010418; EP 1092875 B1 20051130; DE 60024391 D1 20060105; DE 60024391 T2 20060817; FR 2799513 A1 20010413; FR 2799513 B1 20020118

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151006

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151007

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-11-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060224

2006-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60024391

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-11-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-11-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051130

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI