Global Patent Index - EP 1092901 A2

EP 1092901 A2 2001-04-18 - Method for removing and/or replacing an underground conduit

Title (en)

Method for removing and/or replacing an underground conduit

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Beseitigen und/oder Ersetzen einer unterirdischen Rohrleitung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour enlever et/ou remplacer une tuyauterie enterrée

Publication

EP 1092901 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309017 A

Priority

GB 9924112 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a method and apparatus for removal and for replacement of pipes such as underground pipes, and particularly, though not exclusively a method and apparatus for removal of lead water supply pipe and, if required, its replacement with a plastics water supply pipe. The invention provides a method of economically removing buried lead pipe from the ground and, if required, for subsequent installation of a plastics pipe more economically than has previously been known. Accordingly the present invention provides a method of removing a buried pipe (15) from the ground (10) comprising: (i) injecting a curable resin (15) into the pipe (15) so as to at least partly fill the pipe (15) with resin; (ii) allowing or causing the resin (15) to cure; and (iii) applying a tensile load to one end of the resin (15)/pipe (5) composite whereby the resin (15)/pipe (5) composite is pulled from the ground (10) in a generally axial direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 1/028

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/30 (2006.01); E21B 23/00 (2006.01); E21B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/30 (2013.01); E21B 23/00 (2013.01); E21B 31/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092901 A2 20010418; EP 1092901 A3 20030402; GB 0025204 D0 20001129; GB 2358449 A 20010725; GB 9924112 D0 19991215

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030606

2004-02-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 16L 1/028 A

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 21B 23/00 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 21B 31/00 B

2003-04-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 21B 7/30 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI