Global Patent Index - EP 1092914 A2

EP 1092914 A2 2001-04-18 - Lighting apparatus

Title (en)

Lighting apparatus

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage

Publication

EP 1092914 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308966 A

Priority

GB 9924173 A

Abstract (en)

A lighting apparatus comprises a number of open square frame modules 10 releasably connected to each other in a row by sprung rivots 14, The modules have a pair of apertures 11 in each side to enable the modules to be connected in a chosen composite array (e.g. rows, columns, or combinations thereof) initially or changed from time to time. A light fitting 15, only one is shown in the Figure, is pivotably supported in each module by opposing sprung stub axle clips. This allows the light fitting 15 to be easily removed for bulb replacement. The apparatus is provided with support arrangements that include anchor brackets 17 and wall brackets 21. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 2/00; F21V 21/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 21/005 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01); F21V 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 2/00 (2013.01); F21V 21/005 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01); F21V 23/06 (2013.01); F21W 2131/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092914 A2 20010418; EP 1092914 A3 20010816; AU 6545700 A 20010426; CN 2447631 Y 20010912; GB 2355298 A 20010418; GB 9924173 D0 19991215; HK 1046214 A2 20021220

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040904

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040423

2002-05-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 2/00 A, 7F 21V 21/005 B, 7F 21W 131/40 B, 7F 21W 131:40 Z

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI