Global Patent Index - EP 1092919 A2

EP 1092919 A2 2001-04-18 - Lighting assembly

Title (en)

Lighting assembly

Title (de)

Leuchteinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 1092919 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122067 A

Priority

  • DE 29918046 U
  • DE 29920334 U

Abstract (en)

The lighting arrangement has at least one light source, a housing (1) at least partly enclosing the light source with a light outlet opening, a transparent cover (8,9) over the opening and an arrangement (1,8) for converting the light from the source into scattered light. This arrangement is mounted so as to illuminate the transparent cover with scattered light.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Leuchteinrichtung, insbesondere als Informations- bzw. Signalleuchte für Aufzüge, mit mindestens einer Lichtquelle und einem die Lichtquelle zumindest teilweise umgebenden Gehäuse mit einer Lichtaustrittsöffnung sowie einer lichtdurchlässigen Abdeckung der Lichtaustrittsöffnung. Um eine Leuchteinrichtung zu schaffen, die ein homogener ausgeleuchtetes Leuchtfeld aufweist und einfach und kostengünstig ausgeführt ist, wird vorgeschlagen, Mittel (1, 8) vorzusehen sind, die das von der Lichtquelle emittierte Licht in Streulicht überführen und die derart angeordnet sind, daß die lichtdurchlässige Abdeckung (8, 9) mit Streulicht beaufschlagt wird. Vorzugsweise hat der Reflektor (1) und/oder das Streuelement (8) ein Lichtstreuvermögen entsprechend einem weißen Farbton, vorzugsweise entsprechend RAL 9003 oder besser. Die Leuchteinrichtung kann im Strahlengang des Lichtes ein für das von der Lichtquelle emittierte Licht selektiv durchlässiges Filterelement (9) aufweisen, die Lichtquelle kann mindestens eine Leuchtdiode (3) aufweisen, deren Hauptabstrahlrichtung vorzugsweise dem Rauminneren des Reflektors (1) bzw. einer Seiten- oder Trennwand (2, 5) der Leuchteinrichtung zugewandt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/14; F21W 111/00; G09F 13/04; F21V 13/04; F21Y 101/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/02 (2006.01); F21S 8/02 (2006.01); F21V 3/04 (2006.01); F21V 7/05 (2006.01); F21V 9/08 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0233 (2013.01); F21S 8/02 (2013.01); F21V 3/04 (2013.01); F21V 7/05 (2013.01); F21V 9/08 (2013.01); F21V 23/00 (2013.01); G09F 13/14 (2013.01); F21V 15/013 (2013.01); F21V 15/015 (2013.01); F21Y 2115/10 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092919 A2 20010418; EP 1092919 A3 20040218

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040819

2004-12-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-11-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 13/14 A

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21W 111/00 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 09F 13/04 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21V 13/04 B

2004-02-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 21Y 101/02 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI