Global patent index - EP 1092942 A2

EP 1092942 A2 2001-04-18 - Device for acceleration of a projectile

Title (en)

Device for acceleration of a projectile

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Beschleunigung eines Projektils

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour accélération d'un projectile

Publication

EP 1092942 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121992 A

Priority

DE 19950002 A

Abstract (en)

The device for propelling a projectile (4) comprises a rod-shaped plasma generator (1) inserted into the back of a loosely packed explosive charge (2). A tightly packed second charge (3) is positioned in front of the first. The two charges have different chemical compositions and different shapes.

Abstract (de)

Mit der Erfindung wird eine Einrichtung zur Beschleunigung eines Projektils (4) unter Einsatz eines Plasmagenerators (1) und der Verteilung eines Plasmabogens in einer Brennstoffmasse vorgeschlagen, bei dem der Plasmagenerator (1) stabförmig ausgebildet ist und zentral in das rückwärtige Ende einer ersten Brennstoffmasse (2) eingeführt ist, an die im vorderen Bereich eine zweite Brennstoffmasse (3) angeschlossen ist. Die beiden Brennstoffmassen (2,3) besitzen unterschiedliche chemische Zusammensetzungen und verschiedenartige geometrische Formgebungen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 19/08; F42B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/0826 (2013.01); F42B 5/08 (2013.01); F42C 19/0811 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1092942 A2 20010418; EP 1092942 A3 20020102; DE 19950002 A1 20010419

INPADOC legal status

2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 42C 19/08 A, 7F 42B 5/16 B, 7F 42B 5/08 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI