Global Patent Index - EP 1093033 A1

EP 1093033 A1 2001-04-18 - A method for direct electrostatic printing using toner particles with adapted charging properties

Title (en)

A method for direct electrostatic printing using toner particles with adapted charging properties

Title (de)

Verfahren zum direkten elektrostatischen Ducken mit Tonerteilchen modifizierter Aufladungseigenschaften

Title (fr)

Méthode d'impression électrostatique directe utilisant des particules de toner avec des caractéristiques de chargement électrique adaptées

Publication

EP 1093033 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203349 A

Priority

EP 99203349 A

Abstract (en)

A method for direct electrostatic printing wherein charged toner particles are brought on the surface of a charged toner conveyor from where they are attracted to an image receiving substrate and wherein the toner particles have adapted charging properties so that the initial charge of them is after printing 1 hour changed by no more than a factor 1.400. The toner particles comprise a charge control agent and a charge limitation agent, the latter preferably being a meso-ionic compound. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/34; G03G 9/097

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/097 (2006.01); G03G 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 9/09758 (2013.01); G03G 15/346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093033 A1 20010418

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI