Global Patent Index - EP 1093091 A2

EP 1093091 A2 2001-04-18 - Installation for data acquisition

Title (en)

Installation for data acquisition

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Datenerfassung

Title (fr)

Installation pour la saisie des données

Publication

EP 1093091 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122065 A

Priority

AT 71799 U

Abstract (en)

Device comprises a reader (3), such as a barcode reader, connected to or integrated with a mobile terminal (5) with the terminal including a browser enabling it to connect to a digital mobile telecommunications network (6a-c, 7) which in turn connects to a stationary analysis device (10).

Abstract (de)

Einrichtung zur Datenerfassung, insbesondere zur Erfassung von Lohn- und/oder Zeitdaten von Arbeitern und der im jeweiligen Zeitabschnitt verbrauchten Materialien und des geleisteten Maschinen- und Geräteeinsatzes, mit einem oder mehreren Lesegeräten und einer Auswerteinrichtung zum Auswerten der gelesenen Daten, wobei jedes Lesegerät (3) mit einem mobilen Terminal (5) in Verbindung steht bzw. darin integriert ist und wobei das mobile Terminal (5) einen Browser aufweist und zur Teilnahme an einem digitalen mobilen Telekommunikationsnetzwerk (6, 7) ausgebildet ist, und daß die vorzugsweise stationäre Auswerteinrichtung (10) einen Browser umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 3/10; G07C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 1/10 (2006.01); G07C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 3/10 (2013.01); G07C 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093091 A2 20010418; EP 1093091 A3 20040825; AT 4105 U1 20010125

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050226

2005-06-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2005-05-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI