Global Patent Index - EP 1093092 A2

EP 1093092 A2 2001-04-18 - ATM with display-shutter

Title (en)

ATM with display-shutter

Title (de)

Selbstbedienungsautomat mit Display-Shutter

Title (fr)

Distributeur automatique avec écran faisant office de volet

Publication

EP 1093092 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117683 A

Priority

DE 19948976 A

Abstract (en)

Automatic teller (10) has an operating field (14) including touch sensitive keys (32) for inputting data and a display for giving instructions or displaying information. In a first position the operating field covers up an opening (12) for dispensing or receiving notes. Once an authorization code or pin is entered the operating field rotates to allow access to the opening (12).

Abstract (de)

Selbstbedienungsautomat (10), bei dem ein Teil des Bedienfeldes (14) mit Elementen (32) als Abdeckung für eine Ein-/Ausgabeöffnung (12) ausgebildet ist. Dieser Teil des Bedienfeldes ist zwischen einer die Öffnung (12) verdeckenden und einer die Öffnung freigebenden Position bewegbar, so daß sie für den Benutzer nur dann sichtbar ist, wenn er sie benötigt <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 9/10 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093092 A2 20010418; EP 1093092 A3 20021002; EP 1093092 B1 20070321; AT 357709 T 20070415; DE 19948976 A1 20010426; DE 19948976 C2 20010913

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080817

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080817

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080817

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070817

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071227

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-08-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-07-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070702

2007-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2007-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 9/02 20060101AFI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 19/00 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2006-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 9/10 20060101ALI20061013BHEP

2003-07-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021116

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WINCOR NIXDORF INTERNATIONAL GMBH

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 9/02 A, 7G 07F 19/00 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI