Global Patent Index - EP 1093093 A2

EP 1093093 A2 2001-04-18 - Vending machine communication interference shield

Title (en)

Vending machine communication interference shield

Title (de)

Selbstbedienungsautomat abgeschirmt gegen Kommunikationen Interferenzen

Title (fr)

Distributeur automatique avec blindage contre les communicaions interférentes

Publication

EP 1093093 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00308778 A

Priority

US 41509199 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and module for use with a vending machine (10) using an optical communication data exchange standard. An optical transceiver (32, 34), such as an IrDA TM compatible transceiver, is mounted on a printed circuit board (50) adjacent to a customer display (28). An isolator (52) is mounted between the IR transceiver (32, 34) and the customer display (28) such that the IR transceiver's (32, 34) performance is not degraded as a result of noise emissions originating from the customer display (28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01); H04B 10/02 (2006.01); H04B 10/10 (2006.01); H04B 10/105 (2006.01); H04B 10/18 (2006.01); H04B 10/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093093 A2 20010418; EP 1093093 A3 20020828; CA 2322272 A1 20010408; JP 2001160782 A 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036672

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI