Global patent index - EP 1093098 A1

EP 1093098 A1 2001-04-18 - Antenna structure with a casing including electronic components

Title (en)

Antenna structure with a casing including electronic components

Title (de)

Antennenstruktur die ein Gehäuse bildet für elektronische Komponente eines tragbaren Gerätes

Title (fr)

Structure formant antenne constituant par ailleurs un boîtier blindé permettant notamment d'accueillir tout ou partie de l'électronique d'une unité portative de faible volume

Publication

EP 1093098 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99120230 A

Priority

EP 99120230 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2001185927A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To actualize an antenna which can easily be arranged and mounted in a small-sized portable communication unit like a wristwatch. SOLUTION: The substantially rectangle extension member (20) that the structure which form an antenna (10) for a small-sized portable unit like a wristwatch has is arranged at a specific distance from a ground surface and short-circuited to the ground surface through one end (20b) between its ends (20a and 20b), and the other end (20a) is free. This structure (10) has a container (11) which contains at least a lid (12), a bottom part (14), and a side wall (13b) and form an important part of the ground surface by having the extension member (20) arranged facing the side wall; and this container (11) form a shield cover capable of storing an electronic circuit of the portable unit and/or all or some of other components. This invention is concerned in a wristwatch having the antenna structure built in.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une structure formant antenne (10) destinée à une unité portative de faible volume, telle une pièce d'horlogerie, et comprenant un élément radiant (20) de forme sensiblement rectangulaire disposé à une distance déterminée d'un plan de masse et court-circuité à ce plan de masse par l'une (20b) de ses extrémités (20a, 20b), l'extrémité opposée (20a) de cet élément radiant (20) étant laissée libre. Selon la présente invention, cette structure (10) comporte un boîtier (11) faisant partie intégrante du plan de masse et comprenant au moins un couvercle (12), un fond (14), et une paroi latérale (13b) en regard de laquelle est disposé l'élément radiant (20), ce boîtier (11) formant un boîtier blindé pouvant recevoir tout ou partie d'une électronique et/ou d'autres composants de l'unité portative. La présente invention concerne également une pièce d'horlogerie incorporant la structure formant antenne susmentionnée. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 5/22; G04B 47/00; H01Q 11/08; H01Q 19/00; H01Q 19/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 99/00 (2010.01); G04B 47/00 (2006.01); G04G 21/04 (2013.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/27 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/08 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/04 (2013.01); G04B 47/00 (2013.01); G04R 60/10 (2013.01); H01Q 1/273 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0421 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093098 A1 20010418; EP 1093098 B1 20030416; CN 1216438 C 20050824; CN 1292583 A 20010425; DE 69906973 D1 20030522; DE 69906973 T2 20040226; HK 1036363 A1 20060616; JP 2001185927 A 20010706; JP 4598939 B2 20101215; US 6373439 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69906973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131011

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131011

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-04-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040119

2003-09-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2003-05-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69906973

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-05-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030416

2002-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASULAB S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI