Global Patent Index - EP 1093099 A2

EP 1093099 A2 2001-04-18 - Automatic detection and signalling system of dangerous or emergency situations

Title (en)

Automatic detection and signalling system of dangerous or emergency situations

Title (de)

Automatische Detektion und Meldesystem von gefährlichen oder Notsituationen

Title (fr)

Détection automatique et système de signalisation de situations dangereuses ou d'urgences

Publication

EP 1093099 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203523 A

Priority

IT MI992146 A

Abstract (en)

An automatic detection and signalling system of dangerous or emergency situations, including a base control unit (10), installed on the premises of the caller which, by pressing a push button (20, 21, 22) or due to the intervention of certain exterior anti-intrusion (48, 78, 79) and ambient (75-77) sensors and detectors, sends an intervention request through a sequence switch to a series of telephone numbers, programmed by the user, and memorized in the system or to an operations centre which identifies the receiver of the request and coordinates the assistance by simultaneous viva voce communication with the caller and phone communication with the helpers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/22 (2006.01); G08B 25/08 (2006.01); G08B 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/22 (2013.01); G08B 25/08 (2013.01); G08B 25/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093099 A2 20010418; EP 1093099 A3 20020403; IT 1315778 B1 20030318; IT MI992146 A1 20010416; IT MI992146 D0 19991014; MX PA00009911 A 20021023

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-23 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038628

2007-07-18 [D18R] REFUSED (DELETED)

2007-03-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060503

2007-01-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030212

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 25/01 A, 7G 08B 25/08 B, 7H 04M 11/04 B, 7H 04M 1/725 B, 7G 08B 25/14 B

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI