Global Patent Index - EP 1093101 A1

EP 1093101 A1 2001-04-18 - Method for automatic synchronization of a remote control key and an associated calculator

Title (en)

Method for automatic synchronization of a remote control key and an associated calculator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum automatischen Synchronisieren eines Fernbedienungsschlüssels mit einem dazugehörigen Rechner

Title (fr)

Procédé de synchronisation automatique entre une clef de télécommande et un calculateur associé

Publication

EP 1093101 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00122485 A

Priority

FR 9912867 A

Abstract (en)

Procedure consists of: (a) transmission by computer of message having desynchronizing , challenge code and associated response code (60); (b) receipt and analysis (70) by key of message, then emission of second message with its response to the challenge code (75); (c) receipt (80) by the computer of the message and code verification, if verified re-synchronize with the key using the challenge code as new base code (100) for opening the vehicle. Method of automatic synchronization between a vehicles remote locking key and a computer placed onboard the vehicle which exchanges controls between it and the key using a code which permits locking and unlocking of the vehicles doors. The method has the following stages: (a) transmission of a locking/unlocking code for opening the vehicles doors (20); (b) receipt by the onboard computer of the transmitted code and analysis of the code (30); (c) detection of de-synchronization between an expected code by the computer and the code transmitted by the key (40).

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un procédé de resynchronisation automatique d'une clef et du véhicule associé. Ainsi, lorsqu'une désynchronisation a été détectée, le procédé selon la présente invention, consiste en : l'émission par le calculateur d'un premier message comportant un code de désynchronisation, un code dit de défi et son code de réponse associé (étape 60), la réception par la clef du premier message et son analyse, la clef émet alors dans un second message sa propre réponse au code défi envoyé par le calculateur (étape 70) et mémorise le code défi en tant que nouveau code de base (étape 75), et la réception (étape 80) par le calculateur du second message et son analyse, pour vérifier que le code réponse envoyé par la clef est correct et dans ce cas le calculateur utilise le code défi comme nouveau code de base (étape 100). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/00; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01); G07C 2209/06 (2013.01); G08C 2201/20 (2013.01); G08C 2201/62 (2013.01); G08C 2201/91 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093101 A1 20010418; EP 1093101 B1 20081203; DE 60040957 D1 20090115; FR 2799862 A1 20010420; FR 2799862 B1 20011214

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60040957

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081203

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2009-11-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090904

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090314

2009-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60040957 P 20090115

2008-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2008-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-11-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE FRANCE

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE S.A.S.

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI