Global Patent Index - EP 1093106 A2

EP 1093106 A2 2001-04-18 - An advertising display unit

Title (en)

An advertising display unit

Title (de)

Werbeanzeigeeinheit

Title (fr)

Unité d'affichage publicitaire

Publication

EP 1093106 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00650153 A

Priority

IE 990848 A

Abstract (en)

An advertising display unit has an outer housing having a display window in a wall of the housing. A tubular poster holding cylinder is rotatably mounted within the housing and carries three posters held against an outer face of the cylinder. A drive motor is operable to rotate the cylinder within the housing to present each poster in turn at the display window for a preset time period for advertising purposes. A lamp mounted within the cylinder back-lights the poster. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093106 A2 20010418; EP 1093106 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030501

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI