Global patent index - EP 1093107 A1

EP 1093107 A1 2001-04-18 - Unrollable display device

Title (en)

Unrollable display device

Title (de)

Abrollbare Anzeigeanordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affichage déroulant

Publication

EP 1093107 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440272 A

Priority

FR 9912987 A

Abstract (en)

The roller display has two rollers (1,2) driven by asynchronous motors (4,5) driving a display strip (3) wound on the rollers. The display is kept under tension in a fixed position by operating the two motors at a reduced feed frequency. When moving the strip to change the display, one motor is operated at a reduced feed frequency, providing a brake and the other motor has the normal feed frequency.

Abstract (fr)

Il est du type comportant deux rouleaux (1, 2) disposés parallèlement dans un plan sensiblement vertical commandés en rotation par des moteurs asynchrones (4, 5) et sur lesquels, en alternance, vient s'enrouler une bande (3) support d'informations, et où les moteurs (4, 5) sont à sens unique d'entraînement en rotation, chacun dans le sens de l'enroulement de la bande (3) sur le rouleau qu'il entraîne. Il comporte en outre des moyens de gestion des moteurs (4, 5) pour : en phase de diffusion d'une information, alimenter les deux moteurs (4, 5) à une fréquence d'alimentation réduite afin de maintenir la bande (3) en tension, et en phase de modification de l'information par le déroulement de la bande (3), alimenter, selon le sens de déplacement à transmettre à ladite bande (3), l'un des moteurs à une fréquence d'alimentation réduite, et l'autre moteur à une fréquence d'alimentation nominale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/295

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/295 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/295 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093107 A1 20010418; FR 2799870 A1 20010420; FR 2799870 B1 20030411; PL 343188 A1 20010423

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-16 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-06-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAPUB, SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE ES FR

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010728

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI