Global Patent Index - EP 1093132 A2

EP 1093132 A2 2001-04-18 - Planer trimming resistor, its application and manufacturing process

Title (en)

Planer trimming resistor, its application and manufacturing process

Title (de)

Planarer Abgleichwiderstand, Anwendungen und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément résistif ajustable, son application et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1093132 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115803 A

Priority

DE 19949607 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a substrate (1), a resistive layer (3) and a contact layer (6) on the resistive layer and with higher conductivity than and in contact with it at least at individual points (4). Material can be removed locally (7) above the resistive layer. The contact layer does not extend beyond the edges of the resistive layer. The resistive and contact layers can be strip-shaped with connection contacts at opposite ends of the contact layer. Independent claims are also included for the following: 1. a resistive bridge circuit; 2. a sensor with a deformable substrate and at least one resistance element; and 3. a method of manufacturing a balancing resistance.

Abstract (de)

Ein Abgleichwiderstand wird hergestellt durch Abscheiden einer Widerstandsschicht (3) auf einem Substrat (1), einer Passivierungsschicht (5) mit Fenstern (4) und einer Kontaktschicht (6), die mit der Widerstandsschicht (3) durch die Fenster (4) in Kontakt steht. Ein Abgleich erfolgt durch Unterbrechen der Kontaktschicht (6) an Engstellen (7). Anwendung für die Herstellung von Hochdrucksensoren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01C 17/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01C 7/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093132 A2 20010418; EP 1093132 A3 20040602; EP 1093132 B1 20051228; DE 19949607 A1 20010419; DE 50011959 D1 20060202; US 6667683 B1 20031223

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130722

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130722

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130722

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50011959

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060405

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011959 P 20060202

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050125

2005-02-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041202

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI