Global Patent Index - EP 1093134 A1

EP 1093134 A1 2001-04-18 - Ignition coil with magnetic core made from iron powder

Title (en)

Ignition coil with magnetic core made from iron powder

Title (de)

Zündspule mit magnetischem Eisenpulverkern

Title (fr)

Bobine d'allumage à noyau magnétique en poudre de fer

Publication

EP 1093134 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402842 A

Priority

FR 9912751 A

Abstract (en)

The ignition coil construction has a magnetic core (2) with primary (3) and secondary (5) winding and a magnetic circuit (6). The magnetic core is circular with an opened out end (10). The magnetic core is made from iron powder with the winding directly coiled. There is a magnetic disc (11) in the open end.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une bobine d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne, comprenant un noyau magnétique (2), un enroulement primaire (3), un enroulement secondaire (5) et un circuit magnétique (6) de retour de flux. Le noyau magnétique (2) possède une section sensiblement circulaire et a au moins une de ses extrémités évasée (10) et est réalisé en poudre de fer comprimée. L'enroulement primaire (3) est directement bobiné sur le noyau magnétique (2) et un aimant (11) en forme de disque est disposé entre l'extrémité évasée du noyau magnétique (2) et le circuit magnétique (6) de retour de flux. Application notamment aux ensembles d'allumage de véhicules automobiles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 5/00; F02P 3/02; H01F 38/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1093134 A1 20010418; FR 2799880 A1 20010420; FR 2799880 B1 20020104

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2003-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAGEM S.A.

2002-07-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2002-03-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT PT

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI